This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:50:57 (UTC).

Beth Garver et al vs Ford Motor Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Beth Garver filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5936

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Garver, Beth

Garver, Dusty

Defendants

Huntington Beach Ford

Ford Motor Company

York Enterprises South , Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dolin, Tionna

Defendant Attorney

Dye, Stephen H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Jurisdictional transfer (CV, JV, SC); Party: Names: Garver, Beth; Garver, Dusty; Ford Motor Company; Huntington Beach Ford; York Enterprises South , Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Restored to court's control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Removal to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Notice - Comment: Defendants Ford Motor Company and York Enterprises South, Inc. D/B/A Huntington Beach Ford's Notice of Removal to Federal Court (May)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: To Complaint ; Atty Dye

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: To Complaint ; Atty Dye

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: (06) UL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less