This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:29:22 (UTC).

Bernard Bohlin vs Roger Poyner et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Bernard Bohlin filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against Roger Poyner. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoelker, James L, Zayner, Theodore C, Takaichi, Drew C and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1836

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stoelker, James L

Zayner, Theodore C

Takaichi, Drew C

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bohlin, Bernard David

Defendants

Poyner, Roger Winton

Poyner & Poyner, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hannon, John Patrick

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Judgment Type: Court Finding (CV); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Poyner, Roger Winton; Poyner & Poyner, LLP; Awarded Against: Bohlin, Bernard David; Status: Active; Status Date: 02/14/2019; Status Comment: It is Ordered, adjudged and Decreed: That judgment be entered in favor of Defendants; that Plaintiff Bernard David Bohlin shall take nothing by way of his Complaint; as the prevailing party, Defendants shall recover from said Plaintiff costs of suit pursuant to a final Cost Bill to be submitted by Defendants. Signed by Judge Kulkarni, D08; Party: Names: Bohlin, Bernard David; Poyner, Roger Winton; Poyner & Poyner, LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Notice - Comment: Notice of Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Hannon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Judgment - Comment: Judgment By Court: Signed by Judge Kulkarni, D08, Hrg. 2/5/19; See Judgment for Details;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: ENV#2497491 / Proposed Order + Judgment: No EFS-020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Order After Hearing - POS - Comment: Re: Demurrer to 1st Amended Complt is Sustains w/o Leave to Amend

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Hearing: Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to the Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; by Defendants Roger Winton Poyner and Poyner & Poyner, LLP (Jerry Hauser)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Takaichi, Drew C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case management statement of Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: served Poyner & Poyner, LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: Old: Self / New: John Hannon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less