Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/01/2019 at 13:38:22 (UTC).

BEAUCHESNE -VS-CHODERA

Case Summary

On 02/28/2002 BEAUCHESNE -VS-CHODERA was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Nichols, Leslie C, Manoukian, Socrates P, Elfving, William J, Kleinberg, James P, Barrett, Thang N, Hatch, Leighton, Jacobs-May, Jamie, Lucas, Patricia M, Brauer, Harry F and Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5627

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Nichols, Leslie C

Manoukian, Socrates P

Elfving, William J

Kleinberg, James P

Barrett, Thang N

Hatch, Leighton

Jacobs-May, Jamie

Lucas, Patricia M

Brauer, Harry F

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richard B. Beauchesne

San Jose, CA 95138

Laura R. Beauchesne

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

J.F. Shea Co., Inc.

State Industries, Inc.

Ann M. Anderson

Eric M. Anderson

Eric & Ann Realty, Inc.

Eric A. Parker

Fatima Freitas

Canaan Enterprises

David W. Lively

Shea Homes Limited Partnership

Realty World Team Advantage

Realty World

Olimpia, Whelan, Lively & Ryan

Timothy R. Chodera

Sandra M. Chodera

Chodera, Timothy R.

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Pacific Wallboard & Plaster Co.

Chodera, Timothy R.

Knight Roofing Company

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard B. Beauchesne

5821 Algonquin Way

San Jose, CA 95138

Defendant Attorneys

Jon B. Zimmerman

227 North First Street, Suite 300

San Jose, CA 95113

Zimmerman, Jon B.

Gordon & Rees Llp

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Crosby & Rowell Llp

299 Third St., 2Nd Floor, The American Bad Bldg.

Oakland, CA 94607

Kevin R. Mintz

1970 Broadway, Suite 1150

Oakland, CA 94612

Mires, Geoffrey A.

Mintz, Kevin R.

Hightower, Sharon L.

Adam R. Bernstein

198 Coffeeberry Drive

San Jose, CA 95123-4434

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Faoro, Dennis L.

Fischer, Todd A.

Other Attorneys

Beauchesne, Richard B.

Shambaugh, Cynthia L.

Jorgensen, Yvonne V.

Seibel, Brian D.

Nelson Perlov & Lee

Olson, Dennis D.

Koletsky, Roy A

Tungpagasit, V. Winnie

1 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2005
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: J.F. Shea Co., Inc.; Party: Name: Shea Homes Limited Partnership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Jacobs-May, Jamie; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Chodera, Sandra M.; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Chodera, Timothy R.; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Beauchesne, Richard B.; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Beauchesne, Laura R.; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Chodera, Sandra M.; Awarded Against: Beauchesne, Laura R.; Comment: printdate=May 3 2006; freetext=richard b. and laura r beauchesne will pay to timothy r. chodera and sandra m. chodera the sum of $100,000.00 upon submission to the court of proof that the abstracts of judgment have been released. said funds shall be paid to the choderas; origjudgdate=Mar 10 2006; judgstatusdate=May 3 2006; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=37UN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2008
  • Review: Case Status - Original Type: Review: Case Status; Judicial Officer: Jacobs-May, Jamie; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Orders Issued; Comment: Text = further hearing Result By = C Result Judge = JJM - Jacobs-May, Jamie Result Date = 02/11/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2008
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Jacobs-May, Jamie; Comment: Text = It is order that the Finance division, Superior Court of Santa Clara draw his warrant for the sum of $100,000.00 with interest in favor of the Timothy Chodera and Sandra Chodera, care of David Lively signed by Judge May Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 02/11/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2008
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Jacobs-May, Jamie; Comment: Text = It is order that the Finance division, Superior Court of Santa Clara draw his warrant for the sum of $6,950.72 with interest in favor of the Timothy Chodera and Sandra Chodera, care of David Lively signed by Judge May Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 02/11/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2008
  • Hearing: Motion hearings - Original Type: Hearing: Motion hearings; Judicial Officer: Jacobs-May, Jamie; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Orders Issued; Comment: Text = Re Release of funds Result By = C Result Judge = JJM - Jacobs-May, Jamie Result Date = 01/24/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2008
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Jacobs-May, Jamie; Comment: Text = on Ex Parte Appl. The Choderas pending mtn shall be set for hearing on 1/17/08 at 8:30am Dpt 4. The Beauchesnes opposition papers shall be filed and served no later than 1/11/08, service shall be by fax. The Choderas reply papers shall be filed no later than 1/15/08, service shall be by fax. courtesy copies to be provided to dept 4. Granted by Judge Jacobs-May. Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 01/24/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • Substitution: Attorney - Judicial Officer: Jacobs-May, Jamie; Comment: Text = old David Lively, new Adam Bernstein Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 01/23/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2008
  • Hearing: Motion hearings - Original Type: Hearing: Motion hearings; Judicial Officer: Jacobs-May, Jamie; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Text = RE: Release of funds Result By = C Result Judge = JJM - Jacobs-May, Jamie Result Date = 01/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2008
  • Declaration: In Support - Judicial Officer: Jacobs-May, Jamie; Comment: Text = Decl of Richard B. Beauchesne Re: Notice of Ex Parte to Continue the Hearing Presently set for 1-17-08 (R. Beauchesne) Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support Decision = M Closed = 01/16/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
889 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2002
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = MOTION Description PLTF MEMO OF P'S AND A'S IN OPPOSITION TO THE CHODERA DEFTS MTN FOR ORD (ATTY BEAUCHESNE) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2002
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = MOTION Description PLTF'S OPPOSITION TO THE CHODERA DEFTS MTN FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION(BEAUCHESNE) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2002
  • Request: Judicial Notice - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = MOTION Description REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (ATTY LIVELY) 7/30/02 D2 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2002
  • Memorandum: Points and Authorities - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = MOTION Description MEMO OF P'S & A'S IN SUPPT OF MTN TO COMPEL ARB (ATTY LIVELY) 7/30/02 D2 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2002
  • Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = MOTION Description > NTC OF MTN & MTN TO COMPEL ARB OF TIMOTHY & SANDRA CHODERA (ATTY LIVELY) 7/30/02 D2 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2002
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = MOTION Description DECL. OF RICHRAD B. BEAUCHESNE IN SUPPORT OF PLTF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION(R. BEAUCHESNE) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2002
  • Application and Order: Ex Parte - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = MOTION Description EX PARTE APPL FOR ORDER TO EXTEND TIME OF SEVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLT(R. BEAUCHESNE) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2002
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = MOTION Description ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS &COMPLT (SIGN BY JUDGE MARTIN) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2002
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Comment: Text = MOTION Description > COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS ISSUED; CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED (ATTY BEAUCHESNE) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/1952
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Comment: Text = Todd Fischer Legacy Name = Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 08/25/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REALTY WORLD is a litigant

Latest cases where Knight Roofing Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where SHEA HOMES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where J.F. SHEA CO. INC. AS NOMINEE 1996-1 A NEVADA CORPORATION is a litigant