This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:46:37 (UTC).

BBBB Bonding Corporation vs Rudy Cruz Duenas Jr.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 BBBB Bonding Corporation filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Rudy Cruz Duenas Jr. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Klingsporn, Greg and Kuhnle, Thomas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5943

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Klingsporn, Greg

Kuhnle, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BBBB Bonding Corporation

Defendant

Cruz Duenas Jr., Rudy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Comment: Comment (Case is dimsissed in Court without prejudice.); Party: Names: BBBB Bonding Corporation; Cruz Duenas Jr., Rudy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid 100.00. Cont'd from 11/28/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Notice of Case Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Klingsporn, Greg; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Small Claims Order filed 11/28/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Order - Comment: SMALL CLAIMS ORDER: The next hearing date/time: 2/13/19, 8:30 am, Dept. 14. (View order for full details.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Affidavit - Comment: of Reasonable Diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less