This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:46:33 (UTC).

BBBB Bonding Corporation vs Jose Cortez

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 BBBB Bonding Corporation filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jose Cortez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Klingsporn, Greg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5937

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Klingsporn, Greg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BBBB Bonding Corporation

Bad Boys Bail Bonds

Defendants

Cortez, Jose

Cortes-Rodriguez, Jose Guadalupe

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Klingsporn, Greg; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: BBBB Bonding Corporation; Awarded Against: Cortez, Jose; Amount; Damages: $785.00; Costs: $100.00; Total: $885.00; Comment: Payments are to be made at the rate of: $50.00 per: month, beginning on: 12/03/18 and on the 20th day of each month thereafter until paid in full. If any payment is missed, the entire balance may become due immediately.; Party: Names: BBBB Bonding Corporation; Cortez, Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Comment: 11/28/18 Notice of Entry of Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Klingsporn, Greg; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Affidavit - Comment: of Reasonable Diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less