This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/20/2022 at 18:03:13 (UTC).

Batista v. Humanscale Corporation (PAGA)

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 Batista filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Humanscale Corporation PAGA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3325

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Batista

Defendant

HUMANSCALE CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alex Paul Katofsky

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Order: Deeming Case Complex

9/21/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Civil Lawsuit Notice

9/21/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/21/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/21/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10/12/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Notice

9/22/2022 Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 3; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Anthony Batista,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Anthony Batista,; Comment: NOTICE OF POSTING OF COMPLEX FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Anthony Batista,; Comment: Representative Action Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Anthony Batista,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * PAGA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Anthony Batista,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 2/8/23 at 2:30pm in D3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HUMANSCALE is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara