Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 08:15:33 (UTC).

Basim Jaber et al vs Jarnail Singh et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2016 Basim Jaber filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jarnail Singh. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5828

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jaber, Basin

Singh, David

Jaber, Basim

Jaber, David

Defendants

Kaur, Balbir

Singh, Jarnail

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Jaber, Basim; Jaber, David; Awarded Against: Singh, Jarnail; Kaur, Balbir; Amount; Damages: $10,000.00; Costs: $205.00; Total: $10205.00; Comment: **2nd Amended to list correct zip code of plaintiffs on Judg't Notice--2nd Amended Judg't Notice mailed to parties on 1/13/17.** *Amended to reflect correct spelling of Plt Basim Jaber's name and reflect correct address of parties. --Amended Judg't Notice mailed to parties on 1/11/17* The case proceeds as a default. Judg't is joint and several as to plaintiffs and defendants.; Party: Names: Jaber, Basim; Jaber, David; Singh, Jarnail; Kaur, Balbir

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Jaber, Basim; Jaber, David; Awarded Against: Singh, Jarnail; Kaur, Balbir; Amount; Damages: $10,000.00; Costs: $205.00; Total: $10205.00; Comment: *Amended to reflect correct spelling of Plt Basim Jaber's name and reflect correct address of parties. --Amended Judg't Notice mailed to parties on 1/11/17* The case proceeds as a default.; Party: Names: Jaber, Basim; Jaber, David; Singh, Jarnail; Kaur, Balbir

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Jaber, Basim; Jaber, David; Awarded Against: Singh, Jarnail; Kaur, Balbir; Amount; Damages: $10,000.00; Costs: $205.00; Total: $10205.00; Comment: The case proceeds as a default.; Party: Names: Jaber, Basim; Jaber, David; Singh, Jarnail; Kaur, Balbir

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Judgment: Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Hearing: Motion hearings - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Motion to Vacate Judg't.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Motion to Vacate - Small Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less