This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:50:27 (UTC).

Barclays Bank Delaware vs Tuan Nguyen

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Barclays Bank Delaware filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tuan Nguyen. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6081

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barclays Bank Delaware

Defendant

Nguyen, Tuan A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tang, Jason W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2018
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: $3608.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Non- Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration in Support of Calculation Accrued Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Declaration: Interest - Comment: Declaration Re: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Declaration: CCP 585 - Comment: Statement of Evidence in Support of Entry of Default Judgment CCP 585 (d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Declaration: CCP 1033 - Comment: Declaration Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Default Entered - Comment: clks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less