Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:32 (UTC).

Barclays Bank Delaware vs Eric Johnson

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Barclays Bank Delaware filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Eric Johnson. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2473

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barclays Bank Delaware

Defendant

Johnson, Eric

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tang, Jason W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Barclays Bank Delaware; Awarded Against: Johnson, Eric; Amount; Damages: $5,481.88; Costs: $294.50; Total: $5776.38; Party: Names: Barclays Bank Delaware; Johnson, Eric

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: $5776.38 (e-serve 05/14/19 #2879316)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Statement - Comment: STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less