This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 05/09/2023 at 18:02:49 (UTC).

Barajas v. Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. (Class Action/PAGA)

Case Summary

On 03/10/2023 Barajas filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Southern California Discount Tire Co , Inc Class Action/PAGA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2412

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesus Barajas

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DISCOUNT TIRE CO., INC.,

AMERICA'S TIRE COMPANY

DISCOUNT TIRE CO, INC.

THE REINALT-THOMAS CORPORATION

DISCOUNT TIRE CERTIFICATE, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Julia Z. Wells

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Lawsuit Notice

3/10/2023 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/10/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

3/10/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

3/10/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Order: Deeming Case Complex

3/20/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/11/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/14/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/14/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/14/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/3/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jesus Barajas,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint [So. Cal. Discount Tire Co., Inc.]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jesus Barajas,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint [Discount Tire Certificate LLC]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jesus Barajas,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint [Discount Tire Co Inc]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jesus Barajas,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint [The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jesus Barajas,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint [America's Tire Company]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/TCZ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Jesus Barajas,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Jesus Barajas,; Comment: Class Action and PAGA Representative Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Jesus Barajas,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action and PAGA Representative Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice 1st CMC set for 6/29/23 at 2:30pm in D1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less