This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:28:34 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. vs Michele Hartley

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Bank of America, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michele Hartley. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1825

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America, N.A.

Defendant

Hartley, Michele L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kennard, Robert S.

Forbes, Jamie Allison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Bank of America, N.A.; Judgment Amount: $9,424.95; Awarded Against: Hartley, Michele L; Amount; Damages: $9,127.95; Costs: $297.00; Total: $9424.95; Party: Names: Bank of America, N.A.; Hartley, Michele L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Comment: Los Angeles, $9605.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Comment: issued 10/10/18, Los Angeles, Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: cost $155.22; date of mailing 4/16/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Comment: Los Angeles Cty. $9,449.95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: total: $9424.95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Dismissal - Comment: as to does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: of nonmilitary status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less