This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:29:00 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. vs Fernando Beltran

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Bank of America, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Fernando Beltran. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1833

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America, N.A.

Defendant

Beltran, Fernando H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tang, Jason W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • Court Trial: Short Cause - Original Type: Court Trial: Short Cause; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:46 AM; Result: Held; Comment: C/F 10/29/18 per M/O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Court Trial: Short Cause - Original Type: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:46 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Def's FTA may result in answer being stricken.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Non-Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Notice - Comment: Requesting and Requiring Parties to Attend Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Court Trial: Short Cause - Original Type: Court Trial: Short Cause; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:46 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Per Law Office of Suttell & Hammer, PLT no longer wishes to pursue default. Default (Envelope: 1443445) is being returned to PLT's counsel unprocessed (Per telephone call with Angie Mu oz on 5/31/18).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant - Comment: Granted by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Answer (Limited): Up to $10K - Comment: **ANSWER STRIKEN PER MO 1/28/19 ***Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less