This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:30:10 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. vs Deborah Terzian

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Bank of America, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Deborah Terzian. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1843

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America, N.A.

Defendant

Terzian, Deborah L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kennard, Robert S.

Forbes, Jamie Allison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Bank of America, N.A.; Judgment Amount: $6,236.78; Awarded Against: Terzian, Deborah L; Amount; Damages: $5,939.78; Costs: $297.00; Total: $6236.78; Party: Names: Bank of America, N.A.; Terzian, Deborah L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Comment: Los Angeles, $6261.78

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: date of mailing 4/16/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: total: $6236.78

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Dismissal - Comment: Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less