Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/09/2018 at 18:50:22 (UTC).

Bad Boys Bail Bonds Inc vs L. Ruiz

Case Summary

On 10/26/2009 Bad Boys Bail Bonds Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against L Ruiz. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Steingart, Lisa and Spalasso, Kenneth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6886

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Steingart, Lisa

Spalasso, Kenneth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bad Boys Bail Bonds Inc

1299 N First Street

San Jose, CA 95112

Defendants

Lorena Ruiz

San Lorenzo, CA 94580

Ruiz, Lorena

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Ruiz, Lorena; Party: Name: Bad Boys Bail Bonds Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Spalasso, Kenneth; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Ruiz, Lorena; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Bad Boys Bail Bonds Inc; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Bad Boys Bail Bonds Inc; Judgment Amount: $2,602.50; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Ruiz, Lorena; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $102.50; Other: $2,500.00; Total: $2602.50; Comment: clerkid=355; printdate=Mar 1 2010; freetext=Default judgment. Defendant Lorena Ruiz shall pay the plaintiff a total judgment amount of $2,602.50. Contract cancelled by judgment.; origjudgdate=Feb 22 2010; judgstatusdate=Mar 1 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Ruiz, Lorena; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Bad Boys Bail Bonds Inc; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Acknowledge Satisfaction of Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2010
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Alameda Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec/Rtn Fully Satis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = alameda $2763.71 Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = costs $100, interest $36.21, credits $0 Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Text = Default judgment for plaintiff for a total judgment amount of $2,602.50. Result By = C Result Judge = KS - Spalasso, Kenneth Result Date = 02/22/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 02/23/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Personal service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = LS - Steingart, Lisa Result Date = 12/14/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 12/21/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 10/26/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim/13 or more claims Decision = M Closed = 10/26/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bad Boys Bail Bonds is a litigant