This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 17:25:10 (UTC).

B. Uppal vs A. Agarwal

Case Summary

On 07/14/2011 B Uppal filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against A Agarwal. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Persky, Aaron and Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8165

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Persky, Aaron

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bhajan Uppal

Milpitas, CA 95035

Uppal, Bhajan

Defendants

Amita Agarwal

Cupertino, CA 95014

Agarwal, Amita

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Agarwal, Amita; Party: Name: Uppal, Bhajan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Persky, Aaron; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Agarwal, Amita; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Uppal, Bhajan; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Agarwal, Amita; Awarded Against: Uppal, Bhajan; Comment: printdate=Oct 18 2011; freetext=Judgment for Appellant Agarwol in the amount of $220.00. Judge Persky; origjudgdate=Oct 18 2011; judgstatusdate=Oct 18 2011; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Agarwal, Amita; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Uppal, Bhajan; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Uppal, Bhajan; Judgment Amount: $7,585.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Agarwal, Amita; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $85.00; Other: $7,500.00; Total: $7585.00; Comment: printdate=Aug 23 2011; origjudgdate=Aug 22 2011; judgstatusdate=Aug 23 2011; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Agarwal, Amita; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Uppal, Bhajan; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds received 11/16/11. Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • Request: Pay Judgment to Court (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Pay Jgmt to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: B. Uppal vs A. Agarwal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = with notice returned to Palo Alto Small Claims Court Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 10/18/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Persky, Aaron; Comment: Text = Judgment for Appellant Agarwol in the amount of $220.00. Judge Persky Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = R Closed = 10/18/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Persky, Aaron; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = AP - Persky, Aaron Result Date = 10/14/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2011
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 09/12/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • Notice: Appeal (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal Decision = M Closed = 10/18/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 08/22/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 10/18/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 07/14/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 08/23/2011

    Read MoreRead Less