This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 03:01:19 (UTC).

B. Synnett vs Shermans Auto Service

Case Summary

On 11/22/2013 B Synnett filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Shermans Auto Service. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Walhurst, William, Zepeda, Carrie and Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************9868

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Walhurst, William

Zepeda, Carrie

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Benoit Synnett

Mountain View, CA 94040

Synnett, Benoit

Defendants

Shermans Auto Service

699 San Antonio Road

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Brauer, Jamie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Brauer, Jamie; Party: Name: Shermans Auto Service; Party: Name: Synnett, Benoit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zepeda, Carrie; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Brauer, Jamie; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Shermans Auto Service; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Synnett, Benoit; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Synnett, Benoit; Judgment Amount: $6,104.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Shermans Auto Service; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $90.00; Other: $6,014.00; Total: $6104.00; Comment: printdate=Mar 26 2014; freetext=Plt Benoit Synnett shall recover from Defs Shermans Auto Service and Jamie Brauer $6,014.00 PLUS $90.00 in costs for a total jmt of $6,104.00. Judge Zepeda; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=0; origjudgdate=Mar 14 2014; judgstatusdate=Mar 26 2014; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Walhurst, William; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Shermans Auto Service; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Synnett, Benoit; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Synnett, Benoit; Judgment Amount: $5,265.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Shermans Auto Service; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $90.00; Other: $5,175.00; Total: $5265.00; Comment: printdate=Jan 3 2014; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Dec 30 2013; judgstatusdate=Jan 3 2014; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Shermans Auto Service; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Synnett, Benoit; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = w/ntc returned to small claims court - Palo Alto Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 03/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Zepeda, Carrie; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = CZ - Zepeda, Carrie Result Date = 03/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: B. Synnett vs Shermans Auto Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Zepeda, Carrie; Comment: Text = Plt Benoit Synnett shall recover from Defs Shermans Auto Service and Jamie Brauer $6,014.00 PLUS $90.00 in costs for a total jmt of $6,104.00. Judge Zepeda Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = R Closed = 03/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 02/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Notice: Appeal (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal Decision = M Closed = 03/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 12/30/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 03/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 11/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $7501-$10000 Decision = M Closed = 01/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less