Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 17:27:52 (UTC).

B. Mendes vs S. Ponce, et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2010 B Mendes filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against S Ponce. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Steingart, Lisa, Mackin McCarthy, Kristine and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0319

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Steingart, Lisa

Mackin McCarthy, Kristine

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bulmaro Mendes

San Jose, CA 95127

Mendes, Bulmaro

Defendants

Sonya Ponce

San Jose, CA 95112

Balas Ponce

San Jose, CA 95112

Ponce, Balas

Ponce, Sonya

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Ponce, Balas; Party: Name: Ponce, Sonya; Party: Name: Mendes, Bulmaro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Ponce, Sonya; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Mendes, Bulmaro; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Mendes, Bulmaro; Judgment Amount: $1,284.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Ponce, Sonya; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $71.00; Other: $1,213.00; Total: $1284.00; Comment: clerkid=275; printdate=Nov 2 2010; freetext=defendant sonya ponce shall pay plaintiff $1213.00 in principal and $$71.00 costs defendant balas ponce is deceased; origjudgdate=Nov 1 2010; judgstatusdate=Nov 2 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Ponce, Balas; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Ponce, Sonya; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Mendes, Bulmaro; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Mackin McCarthy, Kristine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Text = Off calendar by stipulation: Monthly payments granted $ 50.00 per month, begining 7/29/11 & on the last business day of the month thereafter until judgment fully paid. 2nd: payment of $ 50.00 due on 8/2/11 Result By = C Result Judge = KMM - McCarthy, Kristine Result Date = 07/11/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = oex signed and mailed to creditor 6/2/11 Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = issued as to Sonya Ponce for $1,213.00 Legacy Name = SC Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = CC2 - Copeland, Christine Result Date = 11/01/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = CC2 - Copeland, Christine Result Date = 09/27/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = CPT - Tem, Pro Result Date = 08/09/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 07/06/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = claim amount $7500.00 Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 07/06/2010

    Read MoreRead Less