This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/29/2015 at 13:51:50 (UTC).

B. Leung Vs M. Gaona, Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2010 B Leung filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against M Gaona. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, South County Morgan Hill Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5499

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Betty Leung

Defendants

Martin Valdovinos Gaona

Hortensia Valdovinos

All Unnamed Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel T. Paris

3220 Stevens Creek Blvd., Suite A

San Jose, CA 95117-1144

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2010
  • Cv Writ Of Possess/Unsatis Santa Clara, issued 11/23/10 For: Betty Leung / PLT Against: Martin Valdovinos Gaona / DEF Against: Hortensia Valdovinos / DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • Cv Writ Of Possess Issued To Scc For: Betty Leung / PLT Against: Martin Valdovinos Gaona / DEF Against: Hortensia Valdovinos / DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • Cv Judgment total judgment $4,995.00 & possession after 11/30/10 For: Betty Leung / PLT Against: Martin Valdovinos Gaona / DEF Against: Hortensia Valdovinos / DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • Cv At Issue Memo For: Betty Leung / PLT Against: Martin Valdovinos Gaona / DEF Against: Hortensia Valdovinos / DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2010
  • Cv Proof Of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons subserved For: Betty Leung / PLT Against: All Unnamed Occupants / SNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • Order On Court Fee Waiver copy of order mailed to all defts Granted For: Martin Valdovinos Gaona / DEF For: Hortensia Valdovinos / DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • Req To Waive Court Fees file to judge/d105 For: Martin Valdovinos Gaona / DEF For: Hortensia Valdovinos / DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • Cv Case Cover Sheet For: Betty Leung / PLT Against: Martin Valdovinos Gaona / DEF Against: Hortensia Valdovinos / DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • Cv Summons Filed For: Betty Leung / PLT Against: Martin Valdovinos Gaona / DEF Against: Hortensia Valdovinos / DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2010
  • Cv Ud Compl Filed/Summs Iss <$10k **limited file access until 12/14/10** masked file mailed to all defts prejudgment claim of right to possession For: Betty Leung / PLT Against: Martin Valdovinos Gaona / DEF Against: Hortensia Valdovinos / DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • Cv Answer, Ltd <$10K pro per For: Martin Valdovinos Gaona / DEF For: Hortensia Valdovinos / DEF Against: Betty Leung / PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARIS, DANIEL T.