This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/02/2018 at 19:37:41 (UTC).

B. Carbis vs T. Smushko, et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2006 B Carbis filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against T Smushko. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Madden, James P and Kelly, John. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3901

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Madden, James P

Kelly, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brian J Carbis

San Mateo, CA 94403

Carbis, Brian J

Defendants

Tatyana Smushko

Sunnyvale, CA 94085

Niklay Smushko

Sunnyvale, CA 94085

Smushko, Tatyana

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2007
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Smushko, Tatyana; Party: Name: Carbis, Brian J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2007
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kelly, John; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Smushko, Tatyana; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Carbis, Brian J; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Carbis, Brian J; Judgment Amount: $4,423.32; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Smushko, Tatyana; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $70.00; Other: $4,353.32; Total: $4423.32; Comment: printdate=Jan 9 2007; origjudgdate=Jan 8 2007; judgstatusdate=Jan 9 2007; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCDM;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Smushko, Tatyana; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Carbis, Brian J; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec/Rtn Fully Satis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2007
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2007
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JK3 - Kelly, John Result Date = 01/08/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2006
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2006
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Certified Mail Returned to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2006
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Certified Mail Returned to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2006
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Kelly, John; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JK3 - Kelly, John Result Date = 11/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2006
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 10/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2006
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 11/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less