This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 10/08/2020 at 13:38:33 (UTC).

Ayon v. Red Collar Pet Foods, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2020 Ayon filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Red Collar Pet Foods, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Walsh, Brian C. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5255

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Walsh, Brian C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ayon, Frank

Defendant

Red Collar Pet Foods, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Campbell, Jessica Lynn

Defendant Attorney

King, David Paul

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Notice

Notice CMC reset to 10-29-20: Comment: CMC reset from 9/10/20 to 10/29/20

Statement: Case Management Conference

Plaintiff's CMS HRG 9-10-20: Comment: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Notice

Notice CMC reset to 9-10-20 at 230pm: Comment: CMC reset from 9/4/20 to 9/10/20

Notice

Notice CMC reset to 9-4-20: Comment: CMC reset from 7/24/20 to 9/4/20

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order to Transfer Venue: Comment: Stipulation & Order to Transfer Venue - signed/BCW

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: Comment: First Amended Class Action Complaint

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

POS Summons: Comment: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service

POS: Comment: Proof of Service

Notice

Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiff: Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/BCW

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 7/24/20 at 10am in D1; assigned to Hon. Brian C. Walsh for all purposes

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed:

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Plaintiff's CMS HRG 9-10-20: Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: (1st CMC) Proposed Wage and Hour Class Action. Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 5/15/20, when the case was deemed complex. First Amended Complaint filed 7/10/20. Stipulation & Order to Transfer Venue to San Bernardino County Superior Court entered on 7/13/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice: Transmittal (Transfer Out) - Comment: to San Bernardino County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice CMC reset to 10-29-20: Comment: CMC reset from 9/10/20 to 10/29/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Plaintiff's CMS HRG 9-10-20:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice CMC reset to 9-10-20 at 230pm: Comment: CMC reset from 9/4/20 to 9/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice CMC reset to 9-4-20: Comment: CMC reset from 7/24/20 to 9/4/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Stipulation & Order to Transfer Venue: Comment: Stipulation & Order to Transfer Venue - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint Filed - No Fee - FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: Comment: First Amended Class Action Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - POS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiff: Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice: Appearance - Comment: Atty King

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - POS Summons:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Lawsuit Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 7/24/20 at 10am in D1; assigned to Hon. Brian C. Walsh for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons: Issued/Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara