This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 21:38:24 (UTC).

Audrey Lozano and Michael A. Lozano

Case Summary

On 05/28/2014 Audrey Lozano and Michael A Lozano was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Towery, James E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2603

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Towery, James E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Audrey Lozano

Milpitas, CA 95035

Petitioner

Lozano, Audrey

Defendant

Michael Angel Lozano

Respondent

Lozano, Michael Angel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Name: Lozano, Michael Angel; Party: Name: Lozano, Audrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Audrey LOzano and Michael Angel Lozano

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Dissolution/FL2336 Decl Decision = G Closed = 01/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Svc of Preliminary Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 01/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Entry of Jgmt/Cert of Mailing Decision = M Closed = 01/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • Declaration: Default/DS/LS - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default/DS/LS/NL Decision = M Closed = 01/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • Declaration: Property - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Text = comm Legacy Name = FL Property Declaration Decision = M Closed = 01/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • Declaration: Property - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Text = sep Legacy Name = FL Property Declaration Decision = M Closed = 01/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 01/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • Request: Enter Default - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL Req: Entry of Default Decision = G Closed = 01/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Text = served 10/27/14 in person Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 12/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 10/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • Petition: Amended - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Text = 1st Amended Legacy Name = FL Amend Petition Decision = M Closed = 01/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • Conference: Status - Original Type: Conference: Status; Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Referred to Family Court Clinic; Comment: Text = New Petn Filed-JN Result By = C Result Judge = JET - Towery, James Result Date = 09/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Text = SERVED 6/7/14 IN PERSON Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • Declaration: Property - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Text = Separate Legacy Name = FL Property Declaration Decision = M Closed = 05/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 05/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 05/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less