This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/17/2021 at 00:09:55 (UTC).

Audrey Donaldson vs Samsonico USA LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Audrey Donaldson filed an Other lawsuit against Samsonico USA LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1106

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donaldson, Audrey

Audrey Donaldson

Defendants

Samsonico USA LLC

Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bailey, Troy C

Troy C Bailey

 

Court Documents

Order

3/15/2021 Order

Judgment

3/15/2021 Judgment

Minute Order

3/3/2021 Minute Order

Minute Order

2/3/2021 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/22/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

12/4/2020 Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Declaration: In Support

12/4/2020 Declaration: In Support

Affidavit

12/4/2020 Affidavit

Proof of Service: Mail

12/4/2020 Proof of Service: Mail

Motion: Other

12/4/2020 Motion: Other

Clerk Rejection Letter

11/19/2020 Clerk Rejection Letter

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/24/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/24/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/24/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Judgment; Filed By: Audrey Donaldson, Samsonico USA LLC,; Comment: pursuant to proposition 65 settlement and consent judgment - GRANTED by Judge Kirwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: Audrey Donaldson, Samsonico USA LLC,; Comment: Approving Proposition 65 settlement and conset judgment - GRANTED by Judge Kirwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Motion hearings; Department: Department 19; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 3:45PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Audrey Donaldson,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Motion: Other; Filed By: Audrey Donaldson,; Comment: HRG 03/02/2021, 9am, D19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Audrey Donaldson,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit; Filed By: Audrey Donaldson,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Audrey Donaldson,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: Audrey Donaldson,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Comment: Env.# 5260177; This filing requires a $60.00 fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Audrey Donaldson,; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Audrey Donaldson,; Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Audrey Donaldson,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANHEUSER-BUSCH INBEV WORLDWIDE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bailey, Troy C