Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:32:30 (UTC).

ASTREYA PARTNERS, INC. vs NATALIE HEROUX

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 ASTREYA PARTNERS, INC filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NATALIE HEROUX. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Stoelker, James L, Kulkarni, Sunil R and Williams, Helen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1864

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Stoelker, James L

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Williams, Helen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASTREYA PARTNERS, INC.

Defendant

HEROUX, NATALIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cohn, Steven P.

Brody, Philip

Defendant Attorney

Spector, Ross Adam

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • Order After Hearing - POS - Comment: Dissolving TRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Motion: Order - Judicial Officer: Williams, Helen E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Motion for an Order Dissolving the TRO dated July 26, 2019 by Respondent Natalie Heroux (Ross Spector)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF ROSS A. SPECTOR IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO PETITIONER S OPPOSITION RE: RESPONDENT S MOTION TO DISSOLVE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Response/Reply - Comment: REPLY TO PETITIONER S OPPOSITION RE: RESPONDENT S MOTION TO DISSOLVE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Opposition/Objections

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: DECLARATION OF NATALIE HEROUX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Memorandum: Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Motion: Other - Comment: 06/18/19 9AM D. 10 atty Spector RESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISSOLVE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2018
  • First Paper Filed - Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Application for an OSC/TRO re: Preliminary Injunction, by atty Cohn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Application for an OSC/TRO re: Preliminary Injunction, by atty Cohn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Application for an OSC/TRO re: Preliminary Injunction, by atty Cohn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Application for an OSC/TRO re: Preliminary Injunction, by atty Cohn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Memorandum: Points and Authorities - Comment: Application for an OSC/TRO re: Preliminary Injunction, by atty Cohn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies) - Comment: Application for an OSC/TRO re: Preliminary Injunction, by atty Cohn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: PETITION SEEKING EXTRAORDINARY/INJUNCTIVE RELIEF PENDING ARBITRATION OF CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spector, Ross Adam