This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/16/2021 at 13:47:39 (UTC).

ASPHALT SURFACING, INC. et al vs DAVID HENDRICKSON et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 ASPHALT SURFACING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVID HENDRICKSON. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Manoukian, Socrates P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8912

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Manoukian, Socrates P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.

Defendants

PONDEROSA SEVEN

HENDRICKSON, DAVID

SAVIANO COMPANY, INC.

MENDIOLA, PATRICK

RODRIGUEZ, DANNY

RODRIGUEZ, DANIEL

DAVID HENDRICKSON

PATRICK MENDIOLA

DANIEL RODRIGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Davis, Michael J.

Healy, Amber Star

Amber Star Healy

Michael J. Davis

Defendant Attorneys

Wall, J. Joseph, Jr.

Sweet, Jonathan Justin

Preston, Brian P.

Lepera, Joseph A.

J. Joseph Wall

Michael D. Michel

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

6/1/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

6/1/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

6/1/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

6/1/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/30/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/30/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Declaration: Re: Diligence

8/20/2020 Declaration: Re: Diligence

Declaration: Re: Diligence

8/20/2020 Declaration: Re: Diligence

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/20/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/20/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/20/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/20/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Order

6/3/2021 Order

Notice: Entry of Order

6/8/2021 Notice: Entry of Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

6/14/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

6/15/2021 Minute Order

Request: Dismissal

6/22/2021 Request: Dismissal

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.,; Comment: Notice: Entry of Order Granting Stipulation For Continuance of the Case Management Conference Scheduled for June 1, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.,; Comment: CMC 06-01 is continued to 06-29-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation; Filed By: ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.,; Comment: To continue CMC 06-01-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Substitution: Attorney; Filed By: SAVIANO COMPANY, INC.,; Comment: OLD: Atty Sweet, NEW: Atty Michel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: PATRICK MENDIOLA, DANIEL RODRIGUEZ, SAVIANO COMPANY, INC.,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Re: Diligence; Filed By: ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.,; Comment: Affidavit of Due Diligence as to Danny Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Re: Diligence; Filed By: ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.,; Comment: Affidavit of Due Diligence as to Patrick Mendiola

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint as to Danny Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint as to Patrick Mendiola

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint as to Saviano Compnay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint as to Ponderosa Seven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: ASPHALT SURFACING, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAVIANO COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ASPHALT SURFACING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEALY AMBER STAR