This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/11/2019 at 17:18:28 (UTC).

Ashok Aggarwal vs Sanjay Babbar

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Ashok Aggarwal filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sanjay Babbar. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Zayner, Theodore C, Kulkarni, Sunil R and Rudy, Christopher G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5858

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Zayner, Theodore C

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Rudy, Christopher G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aggarwal, Ashok

Defendant

Babbar, Sanjay

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kafka, Joseph R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration: In Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketJudgment: Default - Comment: ***PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketReview: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Rudy, Christopher G; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketDefault Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint RE Sanjay Babbar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less