This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:28:36 (UTC).

Arwa Daniel vs Gilbert Davudcousi

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Arwa Daniel filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Gilbert Davudcousi. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudy, Christopher G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0156

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Rudy, Christopher G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Daniel, Arwa

Respondent

Davudcousi, Gilbert

Minors

Davud, Vienna

Davud, Rylan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Rudy, Christopher G; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Daniel, Arwa; Davudcousi, Gilbert; Davud, Rylan; Davud, Vienna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less