This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/17/2021 at 06:03:59 (UTC).

Arnoldo Duenas-Cazares et al vs Devcon Construction, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Arnoldo Duenas-Cazares filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Devcon Construction, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2820

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vasquez, Lisette

Duenas-Cazares, Arnoldo

Arnoldo Duenas-Cazares

Lisette Vasquez

Defendants

Devcon Construction, Inc.

Hathaway Dinwiddie Constructin Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Davis, Jonathan Ellsworth

Jonathan Ellsworth Davis

Defendant Attorneys

Eileen Regina Ridley

Sara Alexis Levine Abarbanel

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

4/19/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

4/19/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

9/28/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

9/28/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

8/10/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/28/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/28/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Statement: Case Management Conference

2/22/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

3/11/2021 Minute Order

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/18/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/7/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/4/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Minute Order

8/13/2021 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

9/13/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

9/13/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

9/28/2021 Minute Order

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/29/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Hathaway Dinwiddie Constructin Company,; Comment: Answer to Cazares/Vasquez Complaint; Atty: Abarbanel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Arnoldo Duenas-Cazares,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Devcon Construction, Inc.,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Arnoldo Duenas-Cazares, Lisette Vasquez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Devcon Construction, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Devcon Construction, Inc.,; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT : Atty Ridley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Arnoldo Duenas-Cazares,; Comment: $150.00 jury fee deposited for Plaintiffs paid for by Atty Davis.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Arnoldo Duenas-Cazares,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint - Devcon Construction, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Arnoldo Duenas-Cazares,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Arnoldo Duenas-Cazares, Lisette Vasquez,; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Arnoldo Duenas-Cazares, Lisette Vasquez,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Arnoldo Duenas-Cazares, Lisette Vasquez,; Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Devcon Construction, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HATHAWAY DINWIDDIE CONSTRUCTION CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS, JONATHAN E.