This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/27/2021 at 05:46:01 (UTC).

Armis, Inc. v. Keefer

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 Armis, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Keefer. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucas, Patricia M and Rudy, Christopher G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0227

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucas, Patricia M

Rudy, Christopher G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARMIS, INC.

Defendant

KEEFER, CHAD

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tilley, Douglas Stephen

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed:

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 8/11/21 at 2:30pm D3; assigned to Hon. Patricia M. Lucas for all purposes.

Order: Deeming Case Not Complex

Order: Deeming Case Not Complex: Comment: signed/PML.

Order

Civil Supervising Judge's Order and Notice of Reassignment to Case Manager D7 CGR: Comment: Civil Supervising Judge's Order and Notice of Reassignment to Case Manager Hon. Christopher G. Rudy, D7 - signed/Judge Beth McGowen. Envelope #6289618.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: (1st CMC) Case deemed NOT COMPLEX on 4/20/21; matter is now reassigned to D7, Hon. Christopher G. Rudy presiding; CMC to be reset and noticed by the Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Rudy, Christopher G; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Civil Supervising Judge's Order and Notice of Reassignment to Case Manager D7 CGR: Comment: Civil Supervising Judge's Order and Notice of Reassignment to Case Manager Hon. Christopher G. Rudy, D7 - signed/Judge Beth McGowen. Envelope #6289618.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Deeming Case Not Complex - Order: Deeming Case Not Complex: Comment: signed/PML.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Lawsuit Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 8/11/21 at 2:30pm D3; assigned to Hon. Patricia M. Lucas for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons: Issued/Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant