This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/17/2021 at 09:05:00 (UTC).

Arman Zandian vs Nicholas Wages et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 Arman Zandian filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Nicholas Wages. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3581

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zandian, Arman

Arman Zandian

Defendants

Wages, Nicholas Allen

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES, INC.

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT, INC.

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPING

Nicholas Allen Wages

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Atterbury, Jeff B.

Jeff B. Atterbury

Defendant Attorney

Bret Alan Lunsford

 

Court Documents

Request: Dismissal

4/14/2021 Request: Dismissal

Minute Order

4/7/2021 Minute Order

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/5/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Statement: Case Management Conference

3/29/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

3/29/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Notice

3/29/2021 Notice

Statement: Case Management Conference

3/15/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/17/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/17/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES, INC.,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Arman Zandian,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 3:45PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES, INC.,; Comment: To Complaint atty: lunsford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES, INC.,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Arman Zandian,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Arman Zandian,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Arman Zandian,; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Arman Zandian,; Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT INC. FKA VALLEYCREST LANDSCAPE DEVELOPMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUNSFORD BRET ALAN ESQ