Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:48 (UTC).

Arlen Grossman vs General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Arlen Grossman filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2501

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grossman, Arlen

Defendant

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tai, Daniel C.

Defendant Attorneys

Saluja, Deepika Singh

Thompson, Deepika S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: Re: Default **Order Def's Answer is Stricken for Non-Appearance on 4-11-19**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Reserved - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Mtn. for Reconsiderations by Def. (Jacquelin Mandel) Veronica 949-777-6032 TT 04/23/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: env #02840088 - mtn to reconsider- $60.00 filing fee is required for filing. Please attach fees and resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: #2797760 -$60 filing fee is not attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Comment: re: reporter Noelia Espinola for 04/25/19 hearing - GRANTED by Judge Pierce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Motion: Compel - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Defendant General Motors, LLC Objections; and Further Responses to Plt's Request for Production of Documents, Set One; by Plt. Arlen Grossman (Hayk Proshyan) *C/F 3-5-19*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Order - Comment: re: Striking Def General Motors LLC's Answer for Failure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear - Original Type: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Def's FTA may result in answer being stricken.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2018
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 jury fee paid by plaintiff Arlen Grossman by Atty Proshyan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Notice - Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: **Order striking Answer for Non-Appearance filed on 4-12-19* Answer to Complaint. Atty Thompson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Envelope #: 1904506 RE: Answer - A first appearance fee of $435 is due at the time of entering the case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less