This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/17/2021 at 12:27:54 (UTC).

ARGONAUT ASSOCIATES, LLC vs REBEL RIDERS, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 ARGONAUT ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against REBEL RIDERS, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Manoukian, Socrates P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3778

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Manoukian, Socrates P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARGONAUT ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

REBEL RIDERS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shapiro, Sarahann

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketHearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: Conditional.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice: Settlement - Comment: Conditional 09-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPIRO, SARAHANN