This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:48:31 (UTC).

Apoyo Financiero Inc. vs Alberto Gomez Marquez

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Apoyo Financiero Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Alberto Gomez Marquez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5963

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Apoyo Financiero Inc.

Defendant

Gomez Marquez, Alberto

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Apoyo Financiero Inc.; Awarded Against: Gomez Marquez, Alberto; Amount; Damages: $1,984.89; Costs: $175.00; Total: $2159.89; Comment: Contract is canceled.; Party: Names: Apoyo Financiero Inc.; Gomez Marquez, Alberto

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Comment: Monterey Co. $ 2514.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: Costs $ 300.00, Credit $ 0.00, Interest $ 30.89 DOM: 2/2/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Paid $ 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Comment: Hrg: 12/13/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Comment: Hrg: 12/13/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less