This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/03/2022 at 17:07:45 (UTC).

Antonio Prado and Rae A. Prado

Case Summary

On 08/29/2014 Antonio Prado and Rae A Prado was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3169

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Antonio Prado

Respondent

Rae Ann Prado

Minors

Anatacio Prado

Rolando Prado

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Default/DS/LS; Filed By: Rae Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default/DS/LS/NL Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Default/DS/LS; Filed By: Antonio Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default/DS/LS/NL Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: Appearance Stipulation & Waiver; Filed By: Antonio Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Appear/Stip/Waiver Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final); Filed By: Antonio Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Service of Final Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Antonio Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final); Filed By: Rae Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Service of Final Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Rae Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336; Filed By: Antonio Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Dissolution/FL2336 Decl Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family); Filed By: Antonio Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Entry of Jgmt/Cert of Mailing Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: Miscellaneous: Converted Document; Comment: Antonio Prado and Rae Ann Prado

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Rae Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 10/03/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • DocketDescription: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001); Filed By: Rae Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 10/03/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Antonio Prado,; Comment: Text = petn, summ, blnk response, uccjea. other: adr options, fl ntc, c/c and appl attach; personal sr vc 9/12/14 @ 720pm Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • DocketDescription: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003); Filed By: Antonio Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 09/03/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution w/minor; Filed By: Antonio Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Antonio Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Antonio Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Residence; Filed By: Antonio Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • DocketDescription: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001); Filed By: Antonio Prado,; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less