This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 05/04/2022 at 17:49:55 (UTC).

Williams v. Health Source Global Staffing, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 Williams filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Health Source Global Staffing, Inc ,. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7836

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antoinette Williams

Defendant

Health Source Global Staffing, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dionisios Aliazis

Kevin Mahoney

Defendant Attorney

Paul Scott Cowie

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/31/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/31/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/31/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Statement: Case Management Conference

2/10/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

2/13/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

2/25/2020 Minute Order

Minute Order

2/25/2020 Minute Order

Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

2/25/2020 Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/25/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Declaration

11/3/2020 Declaration

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

11/3/2020 Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Request: Judicial Notice

1/4/2021 Request: Judicial Notice

Opposition/Objections

1/4/2021 Opposition/Objections

Opposition/Objections

1/4/2021 Opposition/Objections

Proof of Service

1/21/2021 Proof of Service

Response/Reply

1/21/2021 Response/Reply

Response/Reply

1/21/2021 Response/Reply

Minute Order

4/7/2021 Minute Order

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Petition Compel Arbitration; Department: Department 3; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 3; Time: 2:30PM; Result: Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Order re Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Action HRG 4/7/21 - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Health Source Global Staffing, Inc.,; Comment: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Antoinette Williams,; Comment: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Petition Compel Arbitration; Department: Department 19; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Civil Supervising Judge's Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to D3 PML - signed/Judge Beth McGowen.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Antoinette Williams,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Antoinette Williams,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Health Source Global Staffing, Inc.,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Antoinette Williams,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Antoinette Williams,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Antoinette Williams,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Antoinette Williams,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less