This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/19/2018 at 21:51:40 (UTC).

Anthony L. Lee and Maria C. Lee

Case Summary

On 08/15/2014 Anthony L Lee and Maria C Lee was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin, Greenwood, Mary J and Parker, Kimberly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2335

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Greenwood, Mary J

Parker, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Lawrence Lee

Morgan Hill, CA 95037

Petitioner

Lee, Anthony Lawrence

Defendant

Maria Christie Lee

Respondent

Lee, Maria Christie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Wilson, Richard H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Greenwood, Mary J; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Lee, Anthony Lawrence; Lee, Maria Christie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: (r)(p)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Declaration for default filed - Comment: Disso(r)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Conference: Status - Original Type: Conference: Status; Judicial Officer: Greenwood, Mary J; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: Text = set per Atty Marcia Eckley gj; c/f 11/9/15 mins-lci

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = (P) hrg. ordered re: RFO fees $90.00 Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = M Closed = 08/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 08/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • Request for Order: Spousal Support - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Req for Ord:Spousal Support Closed = 10/31/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 08/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 08/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Bulk Scanned Documents-Conversion Case - Comment: Bulk Scan 08-15-14 to 12-15-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = re: Ptn, summs, blank resp. Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/15/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 08/15/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/15/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 08/15/2014

    Read MoreRead Less