Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 09/01/2020 at 06:17:24 (UTC).

ANNETTE KROTOVA BORBA vs SILVER CREEK VALLEY COUNTRY CLUB, INC

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 ANNETTE KROTOVA BORBA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SILVER CREEK VALLEY COUNTRY CLUB, INC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Kirwan, Peter, Zayner, Theodore C, Arand, Mary E and Manoukian, Socrates P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2359

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

Zayner, Theodore C

Arand, Mary E

Manoukian, Socrates P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BORBA, ANNETTE KROTOVA

Defendant

SILVER CREEK VALLEY COUNTRY CLUB, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Caldwell, Michael Train

Defendant Attorney

Thomas, Jennifer Robin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketHearing: OSC Sanctions CRC 3.740 Serve - Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: *continued from 4-30-20*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketHearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: *continued from 4-30-20*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketHearing: OSC Sanctions CRC 3.740 Serve - Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC re: failure to appear as to Plt *Plt's failure to appear may result in dismissal of the case and/or sanctions*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketHearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Of OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketReview: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: *continued from 11/07/19*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketNotice: Change Address/Firm Name - Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketReview: Mediation Status - Original Type: Review: Mediation Status; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 7-16-2019 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketHearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion; Comment: and Failure to Serve *No Special or Telephonic Appearance*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint, Atty Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less