This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 09/16/2022 at 05:12:03 (UTC).

Angela Simkin vs Scott Simkin

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 Angela Simkin filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Scott Simkin. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2021

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Angela Simkin

Respondent

Scott Simkin

Minor

Ethan Simkin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Heather Murray Allan

Respondent Attorney

James Jeffrey Hoover

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation & Order; Comment: re: Child Custody and Visitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Scott Simkin,; Comment: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation & Order; Comment: re: advance of funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Scott Simkin,; Comment: Scott Simkin to Sever Right of Survivorship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Scott Simkin,; Comment: Proof of Service: Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response: Dissolution; Filed By: Scott Simkin,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Scott Simkin,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Angela Simkin,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Angela Simkin,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution w/minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOOVER, JAMES J.