Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 07:52:22 (UTC).

Angela L. Moore and Thomas D. Moore

Case Summary

On 11/05/2014 Angela L Moore and Thomas D Moore was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin and Pennypacker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2431

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Pennypacker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela L Moore

Morgan Hill, CA 95037

Petitioner

Moore, Angela L

Defendant

Thomas D Moore

Morgan Hill, CA 95037

Respondent

Moore, Thomas D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2015
  • Order: Qualified Domestic Relations - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Text = re; IBEW Local 332 Pension Plan Part A & Part B Legacy Name = FL QDRO Decision = M Closed = 05/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Order: Qualified Domestic Relations - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Text = re: National Electrical Benefit Fund Legacy Name = FL QDRO Decision = M Closed = 05/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • Stipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Text = re: Dividing Retirement Benefits Legacy Name = FL Stip and Order Decision = M Closed = 01/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Declaration: Disclosure - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Disclosure Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = preliminary declaration... Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Declaration: Disclosure - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Disclosure Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = preliminary declaration... Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 11/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = petition, summons Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 11/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • Response: Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = w/pos Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 11/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • Bulk Scanned Documents-Conversion Case - Comment: Bulk Scan 11-05-14 to 05-18-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less