This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/16/2020 at 05:21:54 (UTC).

Andre Beaulieu vs Thomas Poore et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Andre Beaulieu filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Thomas Poore. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5878

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beaulieu, Andre

Defendants and Cross Defendants

United Parcel Services, Inc.

Poore, Thomas Nolan

United Parcel Service, Inc.

Poore, Thomas N.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Poore, Thomas Nolan

Poore, Thomas N.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sisneros, Roger L

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Morgenstern, Alexis T.

Jachimowicz, Joshua Robinett

Jachimowicz, Joshua R.

Collinson, Lisa Dawn

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Jachimowicz, Joshua Robinett

Jachimowicz, Joshua R.

Collinson, Lisa Dawn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: 4-14-20 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Comment: Stipulation for Protective Order: Signed by Judge Arand, Dept. 9: EFS 1/31/20rb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketMotion: Compel - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Def UPS to Provide Further Responses to Written Discovery and for Sanctions by Plaintiff Andre Beaulieu (Sami Khadder)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: 12-12-19 Declaration of Alexis T. Morgenstern on behalf of defendant UPS Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Request for Production of Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service: Electronic - Comment: Proof of Service by Electronic Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service: Mail - Comment: Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing (no fee) - Comment: Notice of Motion & Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint. 3/14/19 @ 9AM, D9. Atty Morgenstern

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketDemurrer - Comment: Notice of Demurrer & Demurrer to Complaint. 3/14/19 @ 9AM, D9. Atty Morgenstern

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint - Comment: of Thomas Nolan Poore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: to Cross-Complaint of Thomas Nolan Poore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint. Atty Jachimowicz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less