This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 00:52:30 (UTC).

Abraham Chyung et al vs. Marilyn Fanelli et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 Abraham Chyung filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Marilyn Fanelli. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2101

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chyung, Abraham

Nguyen-Chyung, Amy

Nguyen-Chyung, Amy T.

individually and as co-trustees of THE CHYUNG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, U/A DATED JULY 7, 2018

Amy T. Nguyen-Chyung

Abraham Chyung

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs, Not Yet Classified and Not Classified By Court

Fanelli, Marilyn

Duenas, Rene

The House You Want, Inc.

RealtyVison.Com, Inc.

Tran, Edward

Fanellie, Dominick

Selection Realty & Mortgage

The House You Want

Fanelli, Dominick V.

Individually and as Trustee of Dominick V. Fanelli and Marilyn N. Fanelli Revocable Trust Created

Fanelli, Marilyn N.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Fanelli, Marilyn

Fanellie, Marilyn

Fanelli, Dominick

Fanellie, Dominick

Fanelli, Dominick V.

Individually and as Trustee of Dominick V. Fanelli and Marilyn N. Fanelli Revocable Trust Created

Fanelli, Marilyn N.

Not Classified By Court, Cross Defendants and Defendants

Duenas, Rene

The House You Want, Inc.

RealtyVison.Com, Inc.

Tran, Edward

Selection Realty & Mortgage

The House You Want

Trustees and Cross Plaintiffs

Fanellie, Marilyn

Fanelli, Dominick

Defendants, Cross Defendants, Not Yet Classified and Not Classified By Court

The House You Want, Inc.

RealtyVison.Com, Inc.

Selection Realty & Mortgage

Dominick V. Fanelli

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hamerslough, David M.

David M. Hamerslough

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Widman, Jeffrey P.

Mash, Daniel Joseph

Catalanotti, Peter Christopher

Not Classified By Court, Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Mash, Daniel Joseph

Catalanotti, Peter Christopher

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Peter Christopher Catalanotti

Jeffrey P. Widman

Other Attorneys

Brian J. Hannon

 

Court Documents

Conference: Settlement

1/19/2022 Conference: Settlement

Conference: Settlement

1/19/2022 Conference: Settlement

Conference: Settlement

1/19/2022 Conference: Settlement

Conference: Settlement

1/19/2022 Conference: Settlement

Conference: Settlement

1/19/2022 Conference: Settlement

Conference: Settlement

1/19/2022 Conference: Settlement

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/23/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/23/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/23/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Cross-Complaint

2/21/2019 Cross-Complaint

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

2/21/2019 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Clerk Rejection Letter

2/26/2019 Clerk Rejection Letter

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

3/4/2019 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Notice

8/3/2021 Notice

Statement: Settlement Conference

1/11/2022 Statement: Settlement Conference

Order: Proposed

1/14/2022 Order: Proposed

Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)

1/14/2022 Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)

Statement: Settlement Conference

1/14/2022 Statement: Settlement Conference

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Settlement; Department: Department 2; Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Not Settled: at Mandatory Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Proposed; Comment: re: Ex Parte to Continue Trail Date or OST *PENDING SENT TO JUDGE'S QUEUE*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies); Filed By: Selection Realty & Mortgage,; Comment: for an Order to Continue Trial Date or in the Alternative OST for Motion to Continue Trial Date by Def Slection Realty & Mortage and Edward Tran (Peter C. Catalanotti)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Settlement Conference; Filed By: Amy Nguyen-Chyung, Abraham Chyung,; Comment: Settlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Settlement Conference; Comment: Settlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Marilyn Fanelli,; Comment: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Trial Setting; Department: Department 2; Time: 11:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: RealtyVison.Com, Inc.,; Comment: Notice: Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketDescription: First Paper Filed - Fee; Filed By: Selection Realty & Mortgage, Edward Tran, The House You Want, Inc.,; Comment: Paid for Selection Realty & Mortgage(dba The house you want) and Edward Tran by Atty. Catalanotti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Selection Realty & Mortgage, Edward Tran,; Comment: to complaint: atty Catalanotti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Selection Realty & Mortgage, Edward Tran,; Comment: One of the defendants has not paid the 1st paper filing fee of $435. Therefore, an amount of $435 is due.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketDescription: First Paper Filed - Fee; Filed By: Dominick Fanelli, Marilyn Fanelli,; Comment: First Paper fee's paid for Dominick Fanelli and Marilyn Fanelli in Env. # 2539107

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: Dominick Fanelli, Marilyn Fanelli,; Comment: atty Widman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Dominick Fanelli, Marilyn Fanelli,; Comment: to complaint: atty Widman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Amy Nguyen-Chyung, Abraham Chyung,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Amy Nguyen-Chyung, Abraham Chyung,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Amy Nguyen-Chyung, Abraham Chyung,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES P WALKER TRUST UAD MAY 10 1991 AS AMENDED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hannon, Brian J.