This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 14:28:19 (UTC).

Amit Sarkar vs Cognizant Technology Solutions et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Amit Sarkar filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Cognizant Technology Solutions. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6487

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amit Sarkar

Defendants

Cognizant Technology Solutions

Yugady Technologies and Services, Inc.

SVB Financial Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aaron Nathan Colby

Defendant Attorneys

Alec S DiMario

Keith Franklin Simpson

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

7/12/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

7/12/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

7/12/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Minute Order

12/29/2021 Minute Order

Summons: Issued/Filed

8/2/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/2/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

8/2/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Clerk Rejection Letter

10/25/2021 Clerk Rejection Letter

Proof of Service: Electronic

10/26/2021 Proof of Service: Electronic

Proof of Service: Electronic

10/26/2021 Proof of Service: Electronic

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/29/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/29/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Proof of Service

11/29/2021 Proof of Service

Statement: Case Management Conference

12/3/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Proof of Service

12/3/2021 Proof of Service

Proof of Service

12/3/2021 Proof of Service

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/3/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/3/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Yugady Technologies and Services, Inc.,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Cognizant Technology Solutions, SVB Financial Group,; Comment: Answer Response Denial Demurrer - First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Cognizant Technology Solutions, SVB Financial Group,; Comment: Answer Response Denial Demurrer - First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Cognizant Technology Solutions, SVB Financial Group,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Cognizant Technology Solutions, SVB Financial Group,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Yugady Technologies and Services, Inc.,; Comment: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Yugady Technologies and Services, Inc.,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Cognizant Technology Solutions, SVB Financial Group,; Comment: #7533073 - Cognizant Technology Solutions name on answers are inconsistent. Names are Cognizant Technology Solutions and Cognizant Technology Solutions and Services, Inc. They are 2 separate parties and each would require the $435 FPF. Name in 1st sentence in 1st paragraph on answer for SVB Financial Group states a different defendant name.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Amit Sarkar,; Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Amit Sarkar,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Amit Sarkar,; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SVB FINANCIAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Cognizant Technology Solutions India Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMPSON KEITH F.