This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 15:04:55 (UTC).

Amir Kondori vs APEX Home Builders, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2016 Amir Kondori filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against APEX Home Builders, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Arand, Mary E, Stoelker, James L, Pierce, Mark H, Strickland, Elizabeth and Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0927

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Arand, Mary E

Stoelker, James L

Pierce, Mark H

Strickland, Elizabeth

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kondori, Amir

Defendants

APEX Home Builders, Inc.

Apex Inc. Construction & Plumbing

Drainworks Plumbing Company, Inc.

Apex Home Builders, Inc. and/or Apex, Inc.

Hocke, Wolfgang

Drainworks Plumbing Co.

Community Management Services, Inc.

American Contractors Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McCarthy, Joseph W.

Defendant Attorneys

Decker, Nina

Winters, William W.

Matei, Lorena

De La Pena, Gregory R.

Labarbera, Kevin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Comment: Est. 5 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Conference: Settlement Jury - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Notice - Comment: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Notice: Entry of Order - Comment: Notice: Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Order: Ex Parte - Comment: re: relief from waiver of jury trial - GRANTED. The belatedly deposited jury advance fees deposited by Plt shall be accepted by the Court - signed by Judge Arand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Ex Parte Application - Notice Required - Comment: for relief from waiver of jury trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
193 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2016
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: atty Decker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less