This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:49:43 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs THAIS PALMER

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THAIS PALMER. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6066

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

American Express National Bank

successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FSB

Defendants

Lerner, Thais P

Thais Palmer Assoc

PALMER, THAIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael, Lina M

Defendant Attorney

Finwall, Gordon John

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • Court Trial: Short Cause - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:46 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Memorandum: At Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • General Denial: Limited >$10K to $25K - Comment: General Denial to Complaint. atty: Finwall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less