This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/16/2023 at 01:19:48 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs Thach Cao Aka Thach S Cao

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Thach Cao Aka Thach S Cao. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9942

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

Defendant

Thach Cao Aka Thach S Cao

San Jose, CA 95136

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Janet L. Brown

Douglas S. Wallace

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/13/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

1/13/2023 Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/20/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

2/7/2023 Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Change Address/Firm Name; Filed By: American Express National Bank,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: American Express National Bank,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: American Express National Bank,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: American Express National Bank,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: American Express National Bank,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less