Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:02 (UTC).

American Express National Bank f/k/a American Express Centurion Bank vs Ellen Kaye

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 American Express National Bank f/k/a American Express Centurion Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ellen Kaye. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2407

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank f/k/a American Express Centurion Bank

Defendants

Kaye, Ellen A

Kaye, Ellen Anita

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rymsza, Christina Lynn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: American Express National Bank f/k/a American Express Centurion Bank; Kaye, Ellen A; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Comment: Non Service Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less