Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:37:38 (UTC).

American Express National Bank f/k/a American Express Centurion Bank et al vs Yasha Azryan

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 American Express National Bank f/k/a American Express Centurion Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Yasha Azryan. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2304

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

American Express National Bank f/k/a American Express Centurion Bank

American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FS

Defendant

Azryan, Yasha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael, Lina M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: American Express National Bank f/k/a American Express Centurion Bank; American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FS; Azryan, Yasha; Comment: entire wihout prejudicde by atty Rymsza

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: The entire case as dismissed as of 6-14-19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire wihout prejudicde by atty Rymsza

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Default Entered - Comment: (e-serve 04/22/19 #2792115)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less