Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/24/2018 at 09:54:23 (UTC).

Alycia Osborne vs Proofpoint, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2016 Alycia Osborne filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Proofpoint, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Elfving, William J and Stoelker, James L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5210

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Elfving, William J

Stoelker, James L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Osborne, Alycia

Defendant

Proofpoint, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chetty, Vijayta

Defendant Attorney

Nadeau, Elisa Rene

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Osborne, Alycia; Proofpoint, Inc.; Comment: entire w/prej (VJ Chetty)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Review: Case Status pending Arb - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Re: Stay of Action Pending Private Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Set per 9/13/16 2:15pm M/O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: to Stay Action Pending Private Arbitration Pursuant to CCP 1281.4, Granted by Judge Elfving

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer(s): Elfving, William J, Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Referral: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • First Paper Filed - Fee - Comment: taken on cmc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: cmc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: atty; Chetty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROOFPOINT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nadeau, Elisa Rene