This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:50:35 (UTC).

Ally Bank vs George Aguilar aka George M. Aguilar

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Ally Bank filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against George Aguilar aka George M Aguilar. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6084

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ally Bank

Defendants

Aguilar, George M.

Aguilar, George

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barasch, Adam Neil

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Ally Bank; Aguilar, George; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons (Summons)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Affidavit - Comment: Affidavit Regarding Venue (Affidavits)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K - Comment: Complaint (Case Initiation)

    Read MoreRead Less