This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 19:54:35 (UTC).

ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY vs CORINTHIAN INTERNATIONAL PARKING SERVICES INC.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CORINTHIAN INTERNATIONAL PARKING SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8359

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY

Defendant

CORINTHIAN INTERNATIONAL PARKING SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bruce Mao

 

Court Documents

Request: Dismissal

7/2/2020 Request: Dismissal

Minute Order

5/11/2020 Minute Order

Minute Order

5/11/2020 Minute Order

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/21/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Clerk Rejection Letter

12/11/2019 Clerk Rejection Letter

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Clerk Rejection Letter

12/3/2019 Clerk Rejection Letter

Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

11/12/2019 Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/12/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Clerk Rejection Letter

11/12/2019 Clerk Rejection Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY,; Comment: Env. #3747357, The clerk has already filed your civil case cover sheet on 12/9/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY,; Comment: #3721843 - Civil Case Cover Sheet is missing signature and signature date at bottom of page.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY,; Comment: En 3633209 - The civil case cover sheet has both "Unlimited" and "Limited" jurisdiction selected. Please only select one.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less