This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:50:00 (UTC).

Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company a/s/o Craig Jurney vs Prajakta Joshi

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company a/s/o Craig Jurney filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Prajakta Joshi. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6071

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company a/s/o Craig Jurney

Defendant

Joshi, Prajakta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gaba, Rudy, Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company a/s/o Craig Jurney; Joshi, Prajakta; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Gaba

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Gaba

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Prajakta Joshi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less